THE JOYCE FRANKLAND TRUST, NEWPORT

Charity number: 310862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £4.51k £9.11k £4.80k £4.90k £4.90k
Total expenditure £4.51k £24.73k £10.80k £13.40k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A