SIR GEORGE MONOUX'S EXHIBITION FOUNDATION

Charity number: 310903
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Awards small financial grants to students seeking assistance with their Higher Education. Awards are made annually in September.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Waltham Forest

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 September 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JAMES HEDGES Chair 09 May 2012
None on record
Gerry Lyons Councillor Trustee 24 May 2018
None on record
Tim James Councillor Trustee 24 May 2018
None on record
Mark Hough Trustee 01 March 2017
WALTHAMSTOW HISTORICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
MAUREEN MURRAY Trustee 24 April 2013
None on record
SYLVIA POULSEN Trustee 28 October 2011
None on record
STEVE NEWTON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.81k £45 £10.05k £936 £0
Total expenditure £4.82k £800 £2.90k £6.95k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 02 April 2024 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WALTHAMSTOW TOWN HALL
FOREST ROAD
WALTHAMSTOW
LONDON
E17 4JF
Phone:
02084963592
Website:

No information available