THE COOPERS' COMPANY AND COBORN EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 310935
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bryan Pickering Trustee 08 January 2014 None on record
ANTHONY WILLIAM BEHRENS Trustee 27 March 2017
COOPERS CHARITY CIO Received: On time
THE EQUITIES INVESTMENT FUND FOR CHARITIES (CHARIFUND) Charity is a Common Investment Fund
ALFORD HOUSE Received: On time
THE J L CHARITY TRUST Received: On time
THE GERTRUDE GOURVITCH CHARITABLE TRUST Received: 15 days late
LINDA JOY VAN DEN HENDE Trustee
DYCORTS SCHOOL FUND
DR IAN JAMES MACAULEY FROOD BSC Chair None on record
PAUL LAVER Trustee 01 March 2015 None on record
Ray Williams Trustee 01 November 2014
THE GOLDMAN LECTURESHIP FUND Received: On time
Councillor Christopher Wilkins Trustee 16 July 2018 None on record
JAMES HENRY MULLENGER FRICS Trustee None on record
PETER TIMMS FCA Trustee 08 January 2014 None on record
DOROTHY LILIAN GORSUCH Trustee None on record
Rev TREVOR FRANCIS CRITCHLOW Trustee 17 July 2017
SAMUEL BUTLER'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE ST DUNSTAN'S AND ALL SAINTS STEPNEY PRESERVATION TRUST Received: On time
ARBOUR YOUTH CENTRE Received: On time
THE RATCLIFF EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
CHARITY OF MARY BASTOW Received: On time
The Portal Trust Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST DUNSTAN AND ALL SAINTS, STEPNEY Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD FOR SCHOOLS Received: On time
BRUCE GORDON PICKING Trustee None on record
SARAH CHEALE BA Trustee None on record