Trustees THE ROYAL CALEDONIAN EDUCATION TRUST
Charity number: 310952
Charity reporting is up to date (15 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzanne Wilson | Chair | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Max Ogilvy Young | Trustee | 23 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Alison Lindsay | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catriona Stirling Sutherland-Hawes | Trustee | 03 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carla Louise Grant | Trustee | 03 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Isla Campbell Lupton | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Colin Simon Bult Cook | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Neil Douglas Roderick McLennan | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
GARY GRAY | Trustee | 09 January 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.