Trustees NEWTON EXHIBITION FOUNDATION
Charity number: 311021

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS JILL GEALL | Chair | 12 March 1981 |
|
|||||||
Rachel Cross | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Cllr Bob Deering | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Cllr Rosemary Anne Bolton JP | Trustee | 10 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Cllr Sally Newton | Trustee | 10 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||
LAURA RAMSAY | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Regina Green | Trustee | 08 October 2014 |
|
|
||||||
CLLR PETER ALAN RUFFLES MBE | Trustee | 12 March 1976 |
|
|||||||
Rev HUGH ALAN STEWART BA BTL | Trustee |
|
||||||||
Richard Norman Taylor | Trustee |
|
||||||||
JACKIE LAWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
CLLR MRS BRENDA HADDOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Rev JO LOVERIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.