Accounts and annual returns THE BEARD BEQUEST (ICW THE HERTS AND ESSEX HIGH SCHOOL)

Charity number: 311035
Charity reporting is overdue by 116 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 116 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 116 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 March 2023 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required