CHANCELLORS SCHOOL PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a school PTA that runs fund raising events and activities to generate grants / donations to Chancellors School for education purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 28 January 1971: Standard registration
- CHANCELLOR'S PTA (Working name)
- CHANCELLORS SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
- CHANCELLOR'S SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Annamaria Copsey | Chair | 04 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Wadham | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eroma Daniel | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Zoe Page | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Croston | Trustee | 03 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.74k | £4.14k | £366 | £0 | £8.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.57k | £16.58k | £110 | £183 | £6.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 September 2024 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 September 2024 | 453 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 March 2022 | 253 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 11 February 2021 | 226 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 28TH OCTOBER 1970 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 20TH OCTOBER 1980 AND 3RD OCTOBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF CHANCELLOR'S SCHOOL, BROOKMANS PARK BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISIONS OF FACILITIES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY PUBLIC FUNDS FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NORTH MYMMS PARISH OF HATFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHANCELLORS SCHOOL
PINE GROVE
BROOKMANS PARK
HATFIELD
AL9 7BN
- Phone:
- 01707 650702
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window