Financial history THE INCORPORATED BISHOP'S STORTFORD COLLEGE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 311057
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £21.57m £20.62m £22.24m £21.49m £20.97m
Total expenditure £17.64m £18.47m £18.58m £18.59m £19.41m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £168.05k
Income - Donations and legacies £146.00k £61.00k £138.00k £59.00k £78.53k
Income - Other trading activities £58.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £21.22m £20.41m £20.16m £21.28m £20.67m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £150.00k £148.00k £278.00k £150.00k £219.07k
Income - Other £0 £0 £1.67m £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £17.36m £18.27m £18.42m £18.45m £19.21m
Expenditure - Raising funds £282.00k £205.00k £154.00k £140.00k £200.76k
Expenditure - Governance £38.00k £18.00k £23.00k £21.00k £21.45k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £5.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0