BEECHWOOD PARK SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 311068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katharine Elizabeth Swaine Trustee 03 March 2017 None on record
ANDREW MARK BRISCOE Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
Jennifer Anne Brown Trustee 07 December 2020 None on record
Mark William Hammond Chair 01 December 2015 None on record
Maureen Cussans Trustee 07 September 2021 None on record
JONATHAN WILLIAM JAMES GILLESPIE Trustee 01 December 2014 None on record
Dr RICHARD JAMES MALONEY Trustee 03 March 2017 None on record
Simon James Thompson Trustee 28 April 2017
KIMPTON MEMORIAL HALL CIO Received: On time
DACRE ROOMS KIMPTON CIO Received: On time
WELWYN HATFIELD CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU LIMITED Received: On time
Scott Wallace Black Trustee 28 April 2017 None on record
Guy Peter Freeman Trustee 07 December 2020 None on record
JAMES SIMON HODGSON Trustee 05 December 2014
BEDFORD SCHOOL LUNT-WALDECKER TRUST Received: On time
BEDFORD SCHOOL FOUNDATION Received: On time
ALDWICKBURY SCHOOL TRUST LTD Received: On time
BEDFORD SCHOOL TRUST Received: 171 days late
Neil Grant Scragg Trustee 07 December 2020
UK CENTRE FOR ECOLOGY & HYDROLOGY Received: On time
GAVIN ERIC MAIRS Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
DR RUSSELL MARDON VINER Trustee 15 September 2014 None on record
Clare Elizabeth CUTLER Trustee 24 September 2015 None on record