ST EDMUND'S COLLEGE

Charity number: 311073
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £15.42m £13.62m £14.86m £16.43m £13.82m
Total expenditure £14.56m £13.65m £14.57m £14.78m £13.51m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.57m £128.87k £161.32k £1.62m £7.79k
Income - Other trading activities £67.75k £84.72k £67.09k £81.74k £95.14k
Income - Charitable activities £13.76m £13.41m £14.62m £14.71m £13.13m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £29.53k £982 £6.45k £18.70k £17.39k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £571.23k
Income - Legacies £162.37k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £14.48m £13.57m £14.45m £14.73m £13.45m
Expenditure - Raising funds £81.05k £87.99k £126.96k £58.51k £53.72k
Expenditure - Governance £23.61k £27.69k £29.57k £29.04k £22.01k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0