ST EDMUND'S COLLEGE

Charity number: 311073
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Cardinal Vincent Nichols Trustee 17 May 2021
SEIDS Overdue by 37 days
JOHN MALCOLM CORNELIUS BRYANT BA Trustee 28 June 2012 None on record
JANE EMMA RANZETTA Trustee 20 March 2015 None on record
Rev ALBAN PETER EDMUND MCCOY Trustee 21 March 2014 None on record
Paul John Raynes Chair 09 March 2018
ST EDMUND'S COLLEGE Received: On time
Father Peter Edmund Boyle Harris Trustee 14 May 2021
ST EDMUND'S COLLEGE Received: On time
Nicola Walsh Trustee 01 June 2019
ST EDMUND'S COLLEGE Received: On time
Dr Stephen Grounds Trustee 27 November 2015
ST EDMUND'S COLLEGE Received: On time