LETCHWORTH EDUCATIONAL SETTLEMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a social centre for education and recreation open to all in a friendly, accessible and socially supportive atmosphere.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 04 July 1963: Standard registration
- LETCHWORTH SETTLEMENT (Working name)
- LETCHWORTH ADULT EDUCATIONAL SETTLEMENT (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hilary Jane Kemp | Chair | 30 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Colin Joseph Connelly | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Collette Jeanine Hoefkens | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marine Boulter | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Nicholas John Skinner | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Jason Charles | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Nigel Carrick | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Sarah Alcock | Trustee | 16 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marian Adams | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan William Higbey | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £323.38k | £253.77k | £223.54k | £316.28k | £351.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £272.62k | £196.11k | £263.63k | £315.81k | £346.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £33.74k | £3.37k | £12.15k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 08 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 08 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED FEBRUARY 1972, AS AMENDED 24 NOVEMBER 1995, 15 NOVEMBER 2002 AND 19 NOVEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED ON 10 OCT 2017 AS AMENDED ON 22 NOV 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A CENTRE FOR EDUCATION, RECREATION AND SOCIAL ACTIVITIES OPEN TO ALL IN A FRIENDLY, ACCESSIBLE AND SUPPORTIVE ATMOSPHERE.
Area of benefit
LETCHWORTH AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
229 NEVELLS ROAD
LETCHWORTH GARDEN CITY
HERTS
SG6 4UB
- Phone:
- 01462682828
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window