BISHOPS COLLEGE, CHESHUNT

Charity number: 311097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £14.98k £12.69k £15.41k £15.75k £16.14k
Total expenditure £14.98k £12.69k £15.41k £15.75k £16.14k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A