Financial history Grace Communion International

Charity number: 311098
Charity reporting is up to date (50 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £693.30k £865.54k £718.01k £635.17k £632.60k
Total expenditure £635.41k £675.03k £660.14k £412.59k £744.64k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £635.99k £812.04k £664.97k £588.60k £597.63k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £57.31k £46.50k £53.04k £46.57k £34.75k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £225
Income - Legacies £23.00k £170.28k £18.47k £0 £15.25k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £635.41k £675.03k £660.14k £412.59k £744.64k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £30.70k £38.07k £30.14k £41.40k £60.06k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0