DISS MUSEUM

Charity number: 311120
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 828 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 828 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 03 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 04 October 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 27 October 2014 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required