DISS MUSEUM

Charity number: 311120
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £56.29k £19.70k £15.84k £14.70k £17.95k
Total expenditure £17.19k £43.37k £15.51k £14.27k £16.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £6.44k £4.13k £4.00k