Governing document DISS MUSEUM
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14TH MAY 1969, AS AMENDED 20TH JULY 1994, 17TH JANUARY 2000, 4TH AUGUST 2003 AND 26 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING IN DISS A PUBLIC MUSEUM FOR THE COLLECTION, EXHIBITION AND DISPLAY OF ALL TYPES OF MINERALS, FLORA, FAUNA, DOCUMENTS, HANDMADE ARTICLES AND ALL OTHER TYPES OF EXHIBITS USUALLY COLLECTED FOR STUDY AND DISPLAY IN A PUBLIC MUSEUM AND PARTICULARLY THOSE OF LOCAL INTEREST AND IMPORTANCE.
Area of benefit
DISS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.