THOMAS HEWERS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 311184
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £748 £532 £692 £644 £509
Total expenditure £732 £677 £520 £534 £515
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A