BARTHOLOMEW BALDERSTON'S FOUNDATION

Charity number: 311251
Charity reporting is overdue by 1770 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 309 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 309 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 675 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 675 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1040 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1040 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1405 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1405 days
Annual return 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1770 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1770 days