Accounts and annual returns THE FOUNDATION OF JOANNA SCOTT AND OTHERS

Charity number: 311253
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 29 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 15 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 17 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 10 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window