Financial history THE FOUNDATION OF JOANNA SCOTT AND OTHERS

Charity number: 311253
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £87.83k £78.15k £73.43k £73.85k £64.99k
Total expenditure £87.55k £80.55k £74.95k £80.55k £63.72k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A