Trustees WESTCOTT HOUSE

Charity number: 311445
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rt Revd Paul John Ferguson Chair 16 November 2018
THE YORK DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED
Received: On time
THE YORK DIOCESAN CLERGY DEPENDANTS FUND
Received: On time
TOGETHER MIDDLESBROUGH AND CLEVELAND
Received: On time
THE ANGLICAN-LUTHERAN SOCIETY
Received: On time
Samuel Miles Athelstan Tudor Trustee 10 January 2024
None on record
Revd Rachel Claire Rosborough Trustee 07 November 2023
None on record
Jeffrey Brown Trustee 16 August 2023
SWANSEA AND BRECON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Overdue by 114 days
Revd Canon Dr Flora Jane Louise Winfield Trustee 07 July 2023
None on record
Adam Christopher Morrow Trustee 07 July 2023
None on record
Venerable Dr Alexander James Hughes Trustee 07 July 2023
CHARITY FOR THE RELIEF OF POOR WIDOWS AND CHILDREN OF CLERGYMEN (HUNTS CLERGY CHARITY)
Received: On time
Venerable Mark John Steadman Trustee 07 July 2023
None on record
Natalie Frances Anne Davies Trustee 04 April 2023
None on record
Hannah Margaret Grace Moore Trustee 04 April 2023
None on record
Professor Helen King Trustee 18 November 2022
WATCH (WOMEN AND THE CHURCH)
Received: On time
Professor David Alexander Syme Fergusson Trustee 13 January 2022
THE HENRY MARTYN TRUST
Received: On time
Revd Dr Julian Richard Gotobed Trustee 15 September 2021
None on record
Dr Julia Ann Snyder Trustee 15 September 2021
None on record
Revd Canon Mark David Bennet Trustee 20 October 2020
LADY FRANCES WINCHCOMBE'S THATCHAM FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THATCHAM PAROCHIAL ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
MOOR MEADOW CHARITY
Received: On time
THATCHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION
Overdue by 114 days
Revd Dr Alexander Soenderup Jensen Trustee 17 July 2020
None on record
WILLIAM EDWARD CHAPMAN CVO Trustee 04 October 2019
THE SOCIETY OF THE FAITH (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
Revd Canon Professor James Arthur Walters Trustee 15 March 2019
None on record
The Revd Dr Helen Dawes Trustee 16 November 2018
None on record
Professor Nathan MacDonald Trustee 07 November 2014
ST JOHN'S COLLEGE CAMBRIDGE
Received: On time