PERRY AND HYETT APPRENTICING AND EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 311484
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Educational grants to young people organisations.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £1,247
Total expenditure: £1,545

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 October 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anthony Alexander Chair 13 March 2019
UNITED ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES
Received: On time
BLUECOAT SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
WOTTON UNDER EDGE UNITED CHARITIES FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
Mary Morgan Trustee 20 March 2024
WOTTON UNDER EDGE UNITED CHARITIES FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
BLUECOAT SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
UNITED ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES
Received: On time
John Lewis Trustee 19 October 2022
UNITED ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES
Received: On time
BLUECOAT SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
WOTTON UNDER EDGE UNITED CHARITIES FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
PAUL BARTON Trustee 15 June 2022
UNITED ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES
Received: On time
BLUECOAT SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
WOTTON UNDER EDGE UNITED CHARITIES FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
David Baird Trustee 16 March 2022
BLUECOAT SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
WOTTON UNDER EDGE UNITED CHARITIES FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
Teresa Louise Creese Trustee 28 June 2021
None on record
Lucy Stanley Trustee 10 March 2021
None on record
Jonathan Anthony Turner Trustee 13 June 2018
None on record
DR Sarah Catherine Robinson Trustee 08 March 2017
UNITED ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES
Received: On time
WOTTON UNDER EDGE UNITED CHARITIES FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
BLUECOAT SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
GEORGE DESMOND CARPENTER Trustee
WOTTON UNDER EDGE UNITED CHARITIES FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
BLUECOAT SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.16k £1.19k £1.21k £1.24k £1.25k
Total expenditure £1.20k £1.00k £1.30k £775 £1.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 22 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE CHARITIES OFFICE
PERRY AND DAWES ALMSHOUSES
CHURCH STREET
WOTTON UNDER EDGE
GLOS
GL12 7HE
Phone:
00000 000000
Website:

No information available