Trustees ST MARY REDCLIFFE WITH TEMPLE EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Charity number: 311604

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KAREN BROWN | Chair | 14 November 2014 |
|
|||||
Christina Cunningham | Trustee | 22 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Sylvester | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
DENISE NIXON | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW BURTON | Trustee | 22 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
GRECA WARR | Trustee | 02 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
MRS CLAIRE ALSOP | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev DANIEL TYNDALL | Trustee | 20 May 2013 |
|
|||||
PETER FARR | Trustee | 30 July 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.