Accounts and annual returns ROMNEY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 311637
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 28 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 30 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 16 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 27 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 29 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required