Financial history Minsterworth Free School Foundation

Charity number: 311648
Charity reporting is overdue by 262 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.84k £10.01k £1.91k £3.67k £60.04k
Total expenditure £2.16k £0 £504 £4.54k £66.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £54.38k