Trustees Minsterworth Free School Foundation
Charity number: 311648
Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Michael Ingham | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Smith | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Arlette Elizabeth Lane | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Leslie Brooks | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth Cowdrey | Trustee | 29 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
RITA GARBUTT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.