THE SHAFTESBURY HOMES AND ARETHUSA

Charity number: 311697
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.90m £2.18m £1.91m £4.04m £899.01k
Total expenditure £3.05m £3.02m £2.37m £1.26m £1.05m
Income from government contracts £1.39m £980.00k £777.00k £419.15k £154.35k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £433.00k £228.00k £185.00k £250.93k £690.36k
Income - Other trading activities £55.00k £25.00k £35.00k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.37m £1.89m £1.61m £419.17k £154.35k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £36.00k £33.00k £33.00k £41.68k £30.65k
Income - Other £8.00k £5.00k £51.00k £3.33m £23.66k
Income - Legacies £289.00k £1.00k £0 £150.58k £601.42k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.99m £2.95m £2.30m £1.25m £712.70k
Expenditure - Raising funds £66.00k £71.00k £72.00k £2.23k £10.17k
Expenditure - Governance £124.00k £172.00k £152.00k £77.90k £77.90k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £322.89k