Accounts and annual returns THORNBURY GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 311705
Charity reporting is overdue by 264 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 264 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 264 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 November 2021 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required