BRISTOL BORDEAUX ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 311756
Removed charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/03/1959 AS AMENDED ON 09/02/2006 AS AMENDED ON 07/11/2006 AS AMENDED ON 02/12/2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF FRENCH LANGUAGE, CULTURE, HISTORY, LIFE AND ACTIVITIES. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS AT EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS IN BRISTOL AND THE COUNTIES OF SOMERSET, GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE. TO STRENGTHEN THE EDUCATION AND CULTURAL LINKS BETWEEN THIS COUNTRY AND FRANCE, AND MORE PARTICULARLY BETWEEN BRISTOL AND BORDEAUX
Organisation type
Other
Registration history
  • 19 September 1963 : registered
  • 03 December 2013 : removed (CEASED TO EXIST)
Other names

No other names

What the charity did
  • Education/training
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
How the charity helped
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations