Accounts and annual returns RYDER FAMILY PAPERS TRUST

Charity number: 311784
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 15 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 19 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 03 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 20 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 22 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required