RYDER FAMILY PAPERS TRUST

Charity number: 311784
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £3.85k £2.35k £2.00k £1.10k £2.60k
Total expenditure £1.77k £1.77k £1.77k £1.77k £1.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A