REVEREND THOMAS WOOLSEY'S CHARITY (THORNHAUGH WITH WANSFORD)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity was created to assist financially those in Wansford and Thornhaugh who wish to proceed on to further education. We help by means of a grant in the form of book tokens or special equipment needed for a specific course or other relevant educational costs approved by the Trustees. We also have the capacity to give support to those in need in these villages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 28 September 1962: Standard registration
- THE REVEREND THOMAS WOOLSEY'S CHARITY (THORNHAUGH WITH WANSFORD) (Working name)
- REVEREND THOMAS WOOLSEY'S EDUCATIONAL CHARITY (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JANE DOROTHY TAILBY | Chair | 06 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Frank George Toseland | Trustee | 19 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
LISA CHAMBERS | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|||||
ALAN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STUART LENNOX FOREMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.27k | £3.61k | £3.84k | £4.05k | £4.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.58k | £3.29k | £3.13k | £5.63k | £3.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 December 2023 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
A SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS OF 15TH MAY 2000.
Charitable objects
(A) THE PROMOTION OF THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT (B) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS
Area of benefit
PARISH OF THORNHAUGH WITH WANSFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 ROBINS FIELD
WANSFORD
PETERBOROUGH
PE8 6JW
- Phone:
- 01780782656
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window