Trustees Thomas Deacon Foundation

Charity number: 311852
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Turner Chair 21 May 2013
None on record
Rev Michelle Aleysha Caron Dalliston Trustee 11 January 2023
CHARITY OF MARY SAMBROOK
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST, PETERBOROUGH
Received: On time
MARY LANGTON
Received: On time
CAROLINE HESTER NICHOLSON HETLEY
Received: On time
JOHN WHITE HOMES (WAR MEMORIAL) TRUST
Received: On time
Ruth Whittaker Trustee 15 December 2016
None on record
Nicola Hamilton Trustee 29 July 2015
None on record
Roy Tate Trustee 13 January 2015
None on record
Adrian Andrew Peters Trustee 25 March 2014
None on record
JOHN PEACH Trustee 03 January 2012
None on record