Accounts and annual returns THE BISHOP SUMNER EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 311970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 20 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 25 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 29 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 26 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 02 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required