Trustees THE BISHOP SUMNER EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 311970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev ALAN JOHN CRAWLEY Chair 16 April 2012
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BADSHOT LEA AND HALE
Received: On time
Kris Anne Lawrence Trustee 14 September 2021
None on record
Harriet Partington BA Trustee 05 March 2020
None on record
Mark Merryweather Trustee 03 October 2019
THE HALE COTTAGE TRUST
Received: On time
SORREL PRICE Trustee 27 September 2016
None on record
Pamela Anne Marsham Trustee 22 September 2015
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BADSHOT LEA AND HALE
Received: On time
Deborah Deans Trustee 06 November 2014
None on record