Trustees KINGSWOOD HOUSE SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 312044
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Richard Evans Chair 11 June 2018
None on record
Martin Hale Scott Trustee 20 June 2022
None on record
Richard Brandon Gerard Laudy Trustee 21 June 2021
None on record
ROB JOHNSTONE Trustee 19 November 2014
None on record
ALAN MATTHEWS Trustee 05 April 2012
None on record
MR ALISTAIR GIBBON LAW Trustee
None on record
LINDA SUSAN CULM Trustee
None on record
Dr HYWEL BOWEN-PERKINS Trustee
THE ROYAL MEDICAL FOUNDATION OF EPSOM COLLEGE
Received: On time
EPSOM COLLEGE EDUCATIONAL AWARDS TRUST
Overdue by 78 days
JANE BOURNE Trustee
None on record