THE SAINT JOHN'S SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 312064
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mr Nick Teunon Trustee 20 March 2013 None on record
Simon Williams MA Trustee 30 November 2011 None on record
John Willis Chair 24 March 2010
THE CHARTERED COLLEGE OF TEACHING Received: On time
Alison Pullman MA Cantab Trustee 28 November 2019 None on record
Sandra Phillips BSc Trustee 17 June 2015 None on record
Ed Sanderson MA Trustee 22 June 2016 None on record
John R Gravett Trustee 28 November 2012 None on record
Bruce Shaw BSC MRICS Trustee 24 March 2010 None on record
Scott Williams BA FCMI Trustee 28 November 2019 None on record
Clare Davies BSc Trustee 24 September 2014 None on record
Ruth Marshall BA Trustee 24 September 2014 None on record
Tracey Fantham MA NPQH Trustee 27 September 2017 None on record
Angela Wright Trustee 09 April 2019 None on record
Nicola Senior Trustee 23 April 2020 None on record
Lesley Hume FBCS Trustee 03 December 2015 None on record
MR TIM BECKH Trustee 14 November 2006 None on record