Accounts and annual returns ST IVES (HASLEMERE) LIMITED

Charity number: 312080
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 27 February 2021 23 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 27 February 2020 13 January 2021 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 27 February 2019 20 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 25 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 25 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2016 29 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 29 June 2017 On time Download Open in new window