Financial history ST IVES (HASLEMERE) LIMITED

Charity number: 312080
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 27/02/2019 27/02/2020 27/02/2021
Total gross income £868.69k £787.28k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.14m £230.64k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £868.69k £787.28k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.14m £1.07m N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £5.50k £5.82k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 -£838.82k N/A N/A N/A