WHITECHAPEL GALLERY

Charity number: 312162
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nicola Mary Kerr Trustee 10 November 2015 None on record
Dr David Dibosa Trustee 10 December 2018 None on record
Melanie Manchot Trustee 10 December 2018 None on record
Sarah Isabelle Miller Trustee 08 October 2018 None on record
Peter Alan Carew Trustee 08 October 2018 None on record
Anupam Ganguli Trustee 23 September 2013
NATIONAL ART COLLECTIONS FUND Received: On time
HOUSE OF EUROPEAN ART (LONDON) LIMITED Overdue by 262 days
ALEX SAINSBURY Chair 23 March 2015
THE SAINSBURY ARCHIVE Received: 2 days late
THE GLASS-HOUSE COMMUNITY LED DESIGN Received: On time
RAVEN ROW Received: On time
THE GLASS-HOUSE TRUST Received: On time
MAYDAY ROOMS Received: On time
Jonathan Mark Jebarajan Kanagasooriam Trustee 10 December 2018 None on record
Samantha Leonor Hill Trustee 08 October 2018 None on record
Kevin Joseph Brady Trustee 08 October 2018
AUTO ITALIA SOUTH EAST LIMITED Received: On time
Erin Elizabeth Bell Trustee 08 October 2018 None on record
ANN GALLAGHER Trustee None on record