Financial history THE LONDON MUSEUM TRUST

Charity number: 312174
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £25.44k £26.17k £27.61k £28.44k £32.33k
Total expenditure £17.37k £16.01k £11.06k £12.27k £14.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A