Trustees THE LONDON MUSEUM TRUST

Charity number: 312174
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Clive Bannister Chair 08 November 2013
JOICEY TRUST FUND (ICW THE LONDON MUSEUM
Received: On time
MACKENZIE BELL TRUST FUND (IN CONNECTION WITH THE LONDON MUSEUM )
Received: On time
MUSEUM OF LONDON
Received: On time
Matthew Bell CC Trustee 08 September 2023
MUSEUM OF LONDON
Received: On time
MACKENZIE BELL TRUST FUND (IN CONNECTION WITH THE LONDON MUSEUM )
Received: On time
JOICEY TRUST FUND (ICW THE LONDON MUSEUM
Received: On time
John Foley CC Trustee 07 September 2023
JOICEY TRUST FUND (ICW THE LONDON MUSEUM
Received: On time
AGE UK CITY OF LONDON
Received: 31 days late
MUSEUM OF LONDON
Received: On time
MACKENZIE BELL TRUST FUND (IN CONNECTION WITH THE LONDON MUSEUM )
Received: On time
Samir Patel Trustee 01 July 2023
MACKENZIE BELL TRUST FUND (IN CONNECTION WITH THE LONDON MUSEUM )
Received: On time
MUSEUM OF LONDON
Received: On time
JOICEY TRUST FUND (ICW THE LONDON MUSEUM
Received: On time
Bridget Banton Trustee 01 July 2023
MACKENZIE BELL TRUST FUND (IN CONNECTION WITH THE LONDON MUSEUM )
Received: On time
MUSEUM OF LONDON
Received: On time
JOICEY TRUST FUND (ICW THE LONDON MUSEUM
Received: On time
Simon Morris Trustee 01 October 2022
JOICEY TRUST FUND (ICW THE LONDON MUSEUM
Received: On time
MUSEUM OF LONDON
Received: On time
MACKENZIE BELL TRUST FUND (IN CONNECTION WITH THE LONDON MUSEUM )
Received: On time
Ijeoma Ekwueme-Okoli Trustee 01 October 2022
JOICEY TRUST FUND (ICW THE LONDON MUSEUM
Received: On time
MUSEUM OF LONDON
Received: On time
MACKENZIE BELL TRUST FUND (IN CONNECTION WITH THE LONDON MUSEUM )
Received: On time
Alice Black Trustee 01 October 2022
JOICEY TRUST FUND (ICW THE LONDON MUSEUM
Received: On time
MUSEUM OF LONDON
Received: On time
MACKENZIE BELL TRUST FUND (IN CONNECTION WITH THE LONDON MUSEUM )
Received: On time
Charlotte Twyning Trustee 01 October 2022
JOICEY TRUST FUND (ICW THE LONDON MUSEUM
Received: On time
MUSEUM OF LONDON
Received: On time
MACKENZIE BELL TRUST FUND (IN CONNECTION WITH THE LONDON MUSEUM )
Received: On time
Professor Sir David Cannadine Trustee 24 June 2022
MACKENZIE BELL TRUST FUND (IN CONNECTION WITH THE LONDON MUSEUM )
Received: On time
MUSEUM OF LONDON
Received: On time
JOICEY TRUST FUND (ICW THE LONDON MUSEUM
Received: On time
Gregory Jones KC Trustee 19 May 2022
JOICEY TRUST FUND (ICW THE LONDON MUSEUM
Received: On time
MUSEUM OF LONDON
Received: On time
MACKENZIE BELL TRUST FUND (IN CONNECTION WITH THE LONDON MUSEUM )
Received: On time
THE HONOURABLE THE IRISH SOCIETY
Received: On time
Alison Gowman Trustee 01 April 2022
THE COMPANY OF CHARTERED SURVEYORS CHARITABLE TRUST FUND (1992)
Received: On time
MUSEUM OF LONDON
Received: On time
LONDON ROAD SAFETY COUNCIL
Received: 32 days late
TRUST FOR LONDON TRUSTEE
Received: On time
MACKENZIE BELL TRUST FUND (IN CONNECTION WITH THE LONDON MUSEUM )
Received: On time
THE TRUAN TRUST
Received: On time
THE CITY OF LONDON ARCHAEOLOGICAL TRUST FUND
Received: On time
JOICEY TRUST FUND (ICW THE LONDON MUSEUM
Received: On time
Councillor Kaya Comer-Schwartz Trustee 01 April 2022
MUSEUM OF LONDON
Received: On time
MACKENZIE BELL TRUST FUND (IN CONNECTION WITH THE LONDON MUSEUM )
Received: On time
JOICEY TRUST FUND (ICW THE LONDON MUSEUM
Received: On time
David Wormsley Trustee 01 April 2022
MUSEUM OF LONDON
Received: On time
MACKENZIE BELL TRUST FUND (IN CONNECTION WITH THE LONDON MUSEUM )
Received: On time
JOICEY TRUST FUND (ICW THE LONDON MUSEUM
Received: On time
Lindsay Herbert Trustee 01 April 2022
MUSEUM OF LONDON
Received: On time
MACKENZIE BELL TRUST FUND (IN CONNECTION WITH THE LONDON MUSEUM )
Received: On time
JOICEY TRUST FUND (ICW THE LONDON MUSEUM
Received: On time
Paul Martinelli CC Trustee 01 April 2022
THE CITY OF LONDON ARCHAEOLOGICAL TRUST FUND
Received: On time
MUSEUM OF LONDON
Received: On time
MACKENZIE BELL TRUST FUND (IN CONNECTION WITH THE LONDON MUSEUM )
Received: On time
JOICEY TRUST FUND (ICW THE LONDON MUSEUM
Received: On time
JUDITH PLEASANCE CC Trustee 10 July 2019
MUSEUM OF LONDON
Received: On time
JOICEY TRUST FUND (ICW THE LONDON MUSEUM
Received: On time
MACKENZIE BELL TRUST FUND (IN CONNECTION WITH THE LONDON MUSEUM )
Received: On time
INSURANCE MUSEUM
Received: On time
SHARON AMENT Trustee 04 October 2012
None on record