THOMAS CORAM FOUNDATION FOR CHILDREN (FORMERLY FOUNDLING HOSPITAL)

Charity number: 312278
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jenny Coles Trustee 21 November 2016
CORAM VOICE (FORMERLY VOICE FOR THE CHILD IN CARE) Received: On time
WHAT WORKS FOR CHILDREN'S SOCIAL CARE Recently registered
YOGESH CHAUHAN Trustee 22 June 2016 None on record
Geoff Berridge Trustee 17 January 2014
THE COMPANY OF MANAGEMENT CONSULTANTS CHARITABLE FUND Received: On time
Ade Adetosoye Trustee 17 January 2014
CORAM CAMBRIDGESHIRE ADOPTION LIMITED Received: On time
Kerry Smith Trustee 24 June 2020 None on record
SIR DAVID BELL Chair 15 September 2015
THE INSTITUTE FOR WAR AND PEACE REPORTING (IWPR) Received: On time
MEDIA STANDARDS TRUST Received: On time
THE TRUST FOR THE BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIVE JOURNALISM Received: On time
Judith Trowell Trustee 17 January 2014
CORAM FAMILY AND CHILDCARE LTD Received: On time
THE DAKHLEH TRUST Received: On time
Jill Pay Trustee 29 November 2018
Coram Shakespeare Schools Foundation Received: On time
KIM JOHNSON Trustee 19 June 2018
Coram Beanstalk Received: On time
CORAM LIFE EDUCATION Received: On time
PAUL CURRAN Trustee None on record
Andrew Carter Trustee 23 June 2021 None on record
James Dray Trustee 01 April 2020
Coram Shakespeare Schools Foundation Received: On time
Her Honour Judge Celia Dawson Trustee 21 June 2017
CORAM CHILDREN'S LEGAL CENTRE LIMITED Received: 18 days late
CORAM CAMBRIDGESHIRE ADOPTION LIMITED Received: On time