TWICKENHAM PAROCHIAL SCHOOLS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
All the current work of the charity relates to the provision of school facilities to St Mary's Primary School, Twickenham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 10 March 1971: Standard registration
- ST MARY'S C OF E JM/1 SCHOOL TWICKENHAM (Working name)
- ST MARYS C OF E JM/I SCHOOL-TWICKENHAM (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEFFREY HOPKIN WILLIAMS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Stephen John Tetley | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Charlotte West | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Margaret Mence | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maurice Austin | Trustee | 25 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Hugo Duncan Edward Clark | Trustee | 10 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Anthony Arthur | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £124.98k | £119.17k | £141.00k | £151.08k | £155.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £115.07k | £160.06k | £123.60k | £126.41k | £120.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 11 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 11 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6TH JUNE 1861 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 16 JUL 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT ST MARY’S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL IN THE PARISH OF TWICKENHAM IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND BY: 1) PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING THE BUILDINGS USED BY THE SCHOOL; AND 2) PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
RICHMOND-UPON-THAMES LB
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Clifden Road
TWICKENHAM
TW1 4LX
- Phone:
- 0208 891 0437
- Email:
- tpstreasurer990@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window