WILLIAM DAVIS'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 312314
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £18.99k £20.73k £22.14k £22.69k £17.88k
Total expenditure £0 £124 £10.19k £23.76k £13.23k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A