RICHARD THORNTON FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 312316
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Effectively administer the investments of the Foundation to benefit the children's education at The Priory Church of England Primary School, Queens Road, Wimbledon, SW19 8LX. This is achieved through maintaining the land and buildings in good repair, improving and insuring the school buildings, supporting teaching of the curriculum through the provision of apparatus, equipment and teaching aids.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £14,856
Total expenditure: £13,704

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Merton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 June 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • RICHARD THORNTON'S FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Mills Trustee 08 June 2022
None on record
David Reeves Trustee 27 January 2021
None on record
Dr Simon Hay Trustee 27 January 2021
THE FRANCIS HOLLAND (CHURCH OF ENGLAND) SCHOOLS TRUST
Received: On time
ANAND SHUKLA Trustee 26 June 2019
THE PRIORY SCHOOL FUND
Received: On time
Hubert Child Trustee 13 June 2018
None on record
John Hayward Trustee
MERTON UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY MERTON
Received: On time
JOYCE EDITH CLAY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.61k £10.10k £7.89k £12.42k £14.86k
Total expenditure £8.94k £16.26k £0 £10.07k £13.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 July 2024 162 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
43 KENLEY ROAD
LONDON
SW19 3JJ
Phone:
02085421713
Website:

No information available