Financial history ST CLEMENT DANES EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 312319
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £171.16k £176.42k £155.56k £167.74k £177.32k
Total expenditure £143.65k £162.05k £141.58k £104.49k £125.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A