ST STEPHEN'S SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote religious instruction by means of a Sunday School or otherwise (33%) and to promote religious education (including social and physical) of persons under 25 resident in the parish and in need of financial assisstance (67%)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Islington
Governance
- 28 April 1965: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN CREYKE | Chair |
|
||||||
Ralph Dunham | Trustee | 10 September 2018 |
|
|||||
SE Roberts | Trustee | 10 September 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £214 | £195 | £222 | £230 | £246 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES DATED 13TH MARCH 1883 AND AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 22ND JUNE 1973.
Charitable objects
THE NET INCOME SHALL BE APPLIED AS TO (I) ONE THIRD IN PROMOTING RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND BY MEANS OF A SUNDAY SCHOOL OR OTHERWISE; (II) TWO THIRDS IN OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING)OF YOUNG PERSONS WHO HAVE NOT ATTAINED THE AGE OF 25 YEARS, WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA, AND WHO IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST STEPHEN, CANONBURY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17, CANONBURY ROAD
LONDON
N1 2DF
- Phone:
- 02072267526
- Email:
- office@stsc.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window