THE ALL SAINTS, LEIGH EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Give funds to Ashton Keynes Primary School to assist with childrens educational needs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 24 May 2006: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Deborah Mary Dewes | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Anthony David Beechey | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH HUGHES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN KATHRYN TIPPER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.20k | £4.20k | £4.25k | £4.69k | £5.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £9.90k | £9.90k | £0 | £10.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 1 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROVIDING ITEMS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES FOR THE PUPILS OF ASHTON KEYNES CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL (BEING THE NOMINATED SCHOOL FOR THE CHILDREN OF THE PARISH OF LEIGH) WHICH ADVANCE THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE SAID SCHOOL, NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED FROM SOME OTHER SOURCE.
Area of benefit
ASHTON KEYNES CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
UPPER WATERHAY FARM
WATERHAY
LEIGH
SWINDON
SN6 6QY
- Phone:
- 01285860488
- Email:
- hugh@waterhay.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window